NE LB708 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Approved by Governor on March 3, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Approved by Governor on March 3, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate the requirement to copyright reissue and supplement volumes of the Nebraska Revised Statutes
Title
Eliminate the requirement to copyright reissue and supplement volumes of the Nebraska Revised Statutes
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Hughes [N] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 3, 2022 |
2022-02-28 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 28, 2022 |
2022-02-28 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-02-28 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2022-02-28 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO149 withdrawn |
2022-02-22 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO149 Bracket until April 20, 2022 filed |
2022-02-16 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2022-02-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-02-09 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2022-02-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-02-02 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2022-01-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |