NE LB703 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Approved by Governor on March 09, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Approved by Governor on March 09, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to nuisances in cities and villages
Title
Change provisions relating to nuisances in cities and villages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 09, 2016 |
2016-03-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 03, 2016 |
2016-03-03 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-03-03 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2016-03-01 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2016-02-29 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-02-17 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2016-02-16 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-02-16 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM1877 adopted |
2016-01-27 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM1877 filed |
2016-01-27 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1877 |
2016-01-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 19, 2016 |
2016-01-07 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |