NE LB70 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB70 amended into LB263 by AM538
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to operator's license revocation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to operator's license revocation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB70 amended into LB263 by AM538
2017-02-02LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 14, 2017
2017-01-09LegislatureReferred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
2017-01-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback