NE LB70 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 23 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Communication
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 23 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Communication
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize an occupation tax on certain mechanical amusement devices
Title
Authorize an occupation tax on certain mechanical amusement devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 35-11-3 (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause stricken 30-11-8 (Y: 30 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Legislature - Failed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 32-12-5 (Y: 32 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause stricken 30-11-8 (Y: 30 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Legislature - Failed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 32-12-5 (Y: 32 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Communication |
2015-05-28 | Legislature | Returned by Governor without approval on May 27, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 21, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 35-11-3 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Bloomfield MO133 prevailed |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Bloomfield MO133 Reconsider the vote taken on Final Reading with Emergency Clause attached filed |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause stricken 30-11-8 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Schumacher MO132 withdrawn |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Schumacher MO132 Reconsider the vote taken on Final Reading with Emergency Clause attached filed |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Failed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 32-12-5 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2015-03-24 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST16 |
2015-03-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-03-23 | Legislature | Schumacher AM945 adopted |
2015-03-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER27 adopted |
2015-03-19 | Legislature | Schumacher AM945 filed |
2015-03-10 | Legislature | Attorney General Opinion 15-004 to Smith |
2015-02-12 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER27 filed |
2015-02-12 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER27 |
2015-02-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-02-09 | Legislature | Revenue AM118 adopted |
2015-02-09 | Legislature | Krist AM235 adopted |
2015-02-09 | Legislature | Revenue AM118 pending |
2015-02-05 | Legislature | Krist AM235 filed |
2015-01-30 | Legislature | Revenue AM118 filed |
2015-01-30 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM118 |
2015-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 23, 2015 |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2015-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |