NE LB7 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-07 - Approved by Governor on March 07, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-07 - Approved by Governor on March 07, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change and eliminate provisions relating to signatures and seals under the Engineers and Architects Regulation Act
Title
Change and eliminate provisions relating to signatures and seals under the Engineers and Architects Regulation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Krist [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 07, 2013 |
2013-03-04 | Legislature | Kolowski explanation of vote |
2013-03-01 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 01, 2013 |
2013-03-01 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2013-03-01 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2013-02-26 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2013-02-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2013-02-11 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2013-02-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2013-02-06 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2013-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 23, 2013 |
2013-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |