NE LB694 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB694 amended into LB86 by AM1199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB694 amended into LB86 by AM1199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change matching fund requirements under the Nebraska Affordable Housing Act
Title
Change matching fund requirements under the Nebraska Affordable Housing Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB694 amended into LB86 by AM1199 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2019-03-27 | Legislature | Appropriations AM983 filed |
2019-03-27 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM983 |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 13, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37911 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB694.pdf |