NE LB694 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit cities and villages and counties from taxing or regulating distributed ledger technology
Title
Prohibit cities and villages and counties from taxing or regulating distributed ledger technology
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Blood [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2018-02-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2018 |
2018-02-08 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2018-02-01 | Legislature | Briese name added |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=33912 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB694.pdf |