NE LB691 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for Ornate Box Turtle Conservation license plates
Title
Provide for Ornate Box Turtle Conservation license plates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB691 amended into LB356 by AM731 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37872 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB691.pdf |