NE LB688 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the possession, use, and application of sunscreen for children and students and provide immunity
Title
Provide for the possession, use, and application of sunscreen for children and students and provide immunity
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Blood [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-05 | Legislature | Howard name added |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34017 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB688.pdf |