NE LB688 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require certain law enforcement officers and firefighters to work until age fifty-five to receive full benefits and prohibit elective officers from receiving retirement benefits
Title
Require certain law enforcement officers and firefighters to work until age fifty-five to receive full benefits and prohibit elective officers from receiving retirement benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Smith [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-04 | Title printed. Carryover bill | |
2011-01-26 | Notice of hearing for February 15, 2011 | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=12875 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB688.pdf |