NE LB686 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB739 amended into LB686 by AM1737
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB739 amended into LB686 by AM1737
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to Class IV felonies, post-release supervision, competency to stand trial, restrictive housing, and the long-term restrictive housing work group, create a criminal offense relating to electronic communication devices in correctional facilities, change possession of a deadly weapon by a prohibited person provisions, and provide for deferred judgments by courts
Title
Change provisions relating to Class IV felonies, post-release supervision, competency to stand trial, restrictive housing, and the long-term restrictive housing work group, create a criminal offense relating to electronic communication devices in correctional facilities, change possession of a deadly weapon by a prohibited person provisions, and provide for deferred judgments by courts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Lathrop AM1902 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Legislature - Judiciary AM1737 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Lathrop AM1902 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Legislature - Judiciary AM1737 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB739 amended into LB686 by AM1737 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB684 amended into LB686 by AM1737 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB262 amended into LB686 by AM1737 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB240 amended into LB686 by AM1737 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB233 amended into LB686 by AM1737 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB91 amended into LB686 by AM1737 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB90 amended into LB686 by AM1737 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST30 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Lathrop AM1902 adopted |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Lathrop AM1902 filed |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER125 adopted |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER125 filed |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER125 |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Friesen AM1859 withdrawn |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Friesen AM1859 filed |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1737 adopted |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1737 filed |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1737 |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Judiciary priority bill |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 27, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |