NE LB686 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Summary
Change fees received by clerks and registers of deeds
Title
Change fees received by clerks and registers of deeds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-02-18 | Failed to advance to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-02-18 | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1598 adopted | |
2010-02-08 | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs priority bill | |
2010-02-02 | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1598 filed | |
2010-02-02 | Placed on General File with AM1598 | |
2010-01-13 | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2010 | |
2010-01-08 | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee | |
2010-01-06 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9794 |