NE LB681 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Include elementary and secondary schools in the Nebraska educational savings plan trust and change tax benefits
Title
Include elementary and secondary schools in the Nebraska educational savings plan trust and change tax benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Linehan [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2021-02-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 04, 2021 |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |