NE LB673 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Approved by Governor on May 24, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Approved by Governor on May 24, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change support liens and provide for military parents and children in cases of divorce
Title
Change support liens and provide for military parents and children in cases of divorce
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Flood [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Approved by Governor on May 24, 2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Presented to Governor on May 18, 2011 | |
2011-05-18 | President/Speaker signed | |
2011-05-18 | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 | |
2011-05-18 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2011-05-10 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2011-05-10 | Enrollment and Review ER127 adopted | |
2011-05-05 | Enrollment and Review ER127 filed | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on Select File with ER127 | |
2011-05-04 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2011-05-04 | Judiciary AM1254 adopted | |
2011-04-28 | Judiciary AM1254 filed | |
2011-04-28 | Placed on General File with AM1254 | |
2011-03-14 | Speaker priority bill | |
2011-01-26 | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2011 | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Date of introduction |