NE LB671 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB671 amended into LB191 by AM1330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB671 amended into LB191 by AM1330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow the Nebraska Training and Support Cash Fund to be used for retention of existing employees of Nebraska businesses
Title
Allow the Nebraska Training and Support Cash Fund to be used for retention of existing employees of Nebraska businesses
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB671 amended into LB191 by AM1330 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Conrad MO776 Bracket until June 2, 2023 filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Conrad MO773 Bracket until June 1, 2023 filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Conrad MO777 Recommit to Business and Labor Committee filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Conrad MO775 Recommit to Business and Labor Committee filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Conrad MO772 Recommit to Business and Labor Committee filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Conrad MO774 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Conrad MO771 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6 Section 3(f) filed |
2023-03-15 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2023-03-03 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2023-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2023 |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |