NE LB670 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Morfeld AM1348 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Opportunity Scholarships Act and provide tax credits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Opportunity Scholarships Act and provide tax credits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13LegislatureMorfeld AM1348 filed
2019-05-13LegislatureHunt AM1787 filed
2019-05-13LegislatureLinehan AM1782 filed
2019-05-13LegislatureKolowski AM1351 pending
2019-05-13LegislatureKolowski AM1351 pending
2019-05-13LegislatureRevenue AM1112 pending
2019-04-18LegislatureKolowski AM1350 filed
2019-04-18LegislatureKolowski AM1351 filed
2019-04-11LegislatureRevenue AM1112 filed
2019-04-11LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM1112
2019-02-27LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 07, 2019
2019-02-27LegislatureLinehan priority bill
2019-01-25LegislatureReferred to Revenue Committee
2019-01-23LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback