NE LB669 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide powers for the Director of Banking and Finance regarding conditions on financial institutions
Title
Provide powers for the Director of Banking and Finance regarding conditions on financial institutions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB669 amended into LB92 by AM1364 |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2023 |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |