NE LB669 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change Nebraska Health Care Cash Fund provisions and state intent relating to an appropriation for pancreatic cancer research
Title
Change Nebraska Health Care Cash Fund provisions and state intent relating to an appropriation for pancreatic cancer research
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 12, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37888 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB669.pdf |