NE LB669 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Approved by Governor on February 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Approved by Governor on February 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Revisor bill to repeal obsolete provisions related to educational bridge programs
Title
Revisor bill to repeal obsolete provisions related to educational bridge programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-2-1 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 14, 2018 |
2018-02-08 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 08, 2018 |
2018-02-08 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-02-08 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-2-1 |
2018-02-08 | Legislature | Chambers FA101 withdrawn |
2018-02-08 | Legislature | Chambers FA101 filed |
2018-02-08 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File failed |
2018-01-30 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO191 withdrawn |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO191 Recommit to Executive Board filed |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO190 failed |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO190 Reconsider the vote to bracket filed |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO189 failed |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO189 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Chambers FA93 lost |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Chambers FA93 filed |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |