NE LB661 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for confidentiality of information relating to performing a lethal injection

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for confidentiality of information relating to performing a lethal injection

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2017-04-20LegislatureClements name added
2017-04-19LegislatureChambers AM918 pending
2017-04-19LegislatureChambers AM918 pending
2017-04-19LegislatureChambers AM876 withdrawn
2017-04-19LegislatureChambers MO20 withdrawn
2017-04-04LegislatureChambers AM918 filed
2017-04-03LegislatureChambers AM886 filed
2017-04-03LegislatureChambers AM885 filed
2017-04-03LegislatureChambers AM884 filed
2017-04-03LegislatureChambers AM883 filed
2017-04-03LegislatureChambers AM882 filed
2017-04-03LegislatureChambers AM881 filed
2017-04-03LegislatureChambers AM880 filed
2017-04-03LegislatureChambers AM879 filed
2017-04-03LegislatureChambers AM878 filed
2017-04-03LegislatureChambers AM877 filed
2017-04-03LegislatureChambers AM876 filed
2017-03-23LegislaturePlaced on General File
2017-03-01LegislatureKuehn priority bill
2017-02-09LegislatureAlbrecht name added
2017-01-31LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 09, 2017
2017-01-30LegislatureChambers motion to reconsider the vote on the motion to overrule the Speaker's Agenda failed
2017-01-30LegislatureChambers motion to overrule the Speaker's Agenda failed
2017-01-24LegislatureChambers MO20 Rerefer to Judiciary Committee filed
2017-01-24LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-01-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback