NE LB66 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to stacking of coverage under the Uninsured and Underinsured Motorist Insurance Coverage Act
Title
Change provisions relating to stacking of coverage under the Uninsured and Underinsured Motorist Insurance Coverage Act
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 28, 2017 |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31181 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB66.pdf |