NE LB66 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 11, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 11, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to DNA collection
Title
Change provisions relating to DNA collection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Approved by Governor on April 11, 2012 | |
2012-04-05 | Presented to Governor on April 05, 2012 | |
2012-04-05 | President/Speaker signed | |
2012-04-05 | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 | |
2012-02-01 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2012-01-31 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2012-01-31 | Enrollment and Review ER143 adopted | |
2012-01-17 | Enrollment and Review ER143 filed | |
2012-01-17 | Placed on Select File with ER143 | |
2012-01-11 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2012-01-11 | Cornett AM386 adopted | |
2012-01-11 | Judiciary AM241 adopted | |
2012-01-04 | Title printed. Carryover bill | |
2011-02-17 | Cornett AM386 filed | |
2011-02-11 | Judiciary AM241 filed | |
2011-02-11 | Placed on General File with AM241 | |
2011-01-11 | Notice of hearing for January 19, 2011 | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-01-06 | Date of introduction |