NE LB657 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Nebraska Hemp Farming Act and change provisions relating to the industrial hemp agricultural pilot program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Nebraska Hemp Farming Act and change provisions relating to the industrial hemp agricultural pilot program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-4-2 (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Legislature - Wayne AM1941 adopted (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Legislature - Lowe AM1583 lost (Y: 1 N: 23 NV: 20 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - Legislature - Lowe AM1585 lost (Y: 2 N: 19 NV: 24 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - Legislature - Wayne AM1541 adopted (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 16 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Legislature - Agriculture AM988 adopted (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Legislature - Lowe FA46 lost (Y: 10 N: 27 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31LegislatureApproved by Governor on May 30, 2019
2019-05-30LegislaturePresented to Governor on May 24, 2019
2019-05-24LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2019-05-24LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-4-2
2019-05-24LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2019-05-24LegislatureLowe FA89 withdrawn
2019-05-24LegislatureLowe FA89 filed
2019-05-24LegislatureMotion to return to Select File withdrawn
2019-05-22LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading Second
2019-05-22LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment
2019-05-22LegislatureWayne AM1941 adopted
2019-05-22LegislatureReturned to Select File for specific amendment
2019-05-22LegislatureWayne AM1913 withdrawn
2019-05-22LegislatureWayne AM1860 withdrawn
2019-05-21LegislatureWayne AM1941 filed
2019-05-21LegislatureWayne AM1913 filed
2019-05-16LegislatureWayne AM1860 filed
2019-05-07LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST19
2019-05-02LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2019-05-02LegislatureLowe AM1583 lost
2019-05-02LegislatureLowe AM1583 filed
2019-05-02LegislatureLowe AM1585 lost
2019-05-02LegislatureLowe AM1585 filed
2019-05-02LegislatureWayne AM1541 adopted
2019-05-02LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER87 adopted
2019-05-01LegislatureWayne AM1541 filed
2019-04-17LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER87 filed
2019-04-17LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER87
2019-04-15LegislatureHansen, M. name added
2019-04-15LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2019-04-15LegislatureLowe MO63 withdrawn
2019-04-15LegislatureLowe MO63 Recommit to the Agriculture Committee filed
2019-04-15LegislatureLowe FA46 lost
2019-04-15LegislatureLowe FA46 filed
2019-04-15LegislatureLowe FA45 withdrawn
2019-04-15LegislatureLowe FA45 filed
2019-04-15LegislatureAgriculture AM988 adopted
2019-04-02LegislatureAgriculture AM988 filed
2019-04-02LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM988
2019-03-26LegislatureKolterman name added
2019-03-25LegislatureBrandt name added
2019-03-25LegislatureMurman name added
2019-03-19LegislatureSlama name added
2019-03-19LegislatureBrandt priority bill
2019-02-14LegislatureHunt name added
2019-01-31LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 12, 2019
2019-01-25LegislatureReferred to Agriculture Committee
2019-01-23LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37622
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB657.pdf
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Final/LB657.pdf
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Slip/LB657.pdf
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4473
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4474
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4475
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4662
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4663
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4664
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4909
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4910
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=5049

Bill Comments

feedback