NE LB657 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Provisions/portions of LB593 amended into LB657 by AM829
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Provisions/portions of LB593 amended into LB657 by AM829
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate funds for state government expenses
Title
Appropriate funds for state government expenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB593 amended into LB657 by AM829 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB584 amended into LB657 by AM829 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB537 amended into LB657 by AM829 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB533 amended into LB657 by AM829 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB506 amended into LB657 by AM829 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB496 amended into LB657 by AM829 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB485 amended into LB657 by AM829 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB418 amended into LB657 by AM829 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB417 amended into LB657 by AM829 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB397 amended into LB657 by AM829 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB332 amended into LB657 by AM829 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB318 amended into LB657 by AM829 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB263 amended into LB657 by AM829 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB233 amended into LB657 by AM829 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB229 amended into LB657 by AM829 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB185 amended into LB657 by AM829 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB154 amended into LB657 by AM829 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB110 amended into LB657 by AM829 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB98 amended into LB657 by AM829 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB82 amended into LB657 by AM829 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB57 amended into LB657 by AM829 |
2015-05-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 20, 2015 |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 14, 2015 |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2015-05-12 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2015-05-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-05-06 | Legislature | Scheer FA62 withdrawn |
2015-05-06 | Legislature | Scheer FA62 filed |
2015-05-06 | Legislature | Sullivan AM1567 lost |
2015-05-06 | Legislature | Sullivan AM1567 filed |
2015-05-06 | Legislature | Mello AM1566 adopted |
2015-05-06 | Legislature | Mello AM1508 withdrawn |
2015-05-06 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER114 adopted |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Mello AM1566 filed |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Mello AM1508 filed |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER114 filed |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER114 |
2015-04-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-04-30 | Legislature | Appropriations AM829 adopted |
2015-04-30 | Legislature | Mello AM1484 adopted |
2015-04-30 | Legislature | Mello AM1484 filed |
2015-04-30 | Legislature | Groene AM1469 withdrawn |
2015-04-30 | Legislature | Groene AM1469 filed |
2015-04-30 | Legislature | Harr AM1481 withdrawn |
2015-04-30 | Legislature | Harr AM1481 filed |
2015-04-30 | Legislature | Chambers MO97 withdrawn |
2015-04-30 | Legislature | Chambers MO97 Bracket until June 5, 2015 filed |
2015-04-30 | Legislature | Chambers AM1433 withdrawn |
2015-04-30 | Legislature | Chambers AM1433 filed |
2015-04-30 | Legislature | Appropriations AM829 pending |
2015-04-28 | Legislature | Appropriations AM829 filed |
2015-04-28 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM829 |
2015-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 23, 2015 |
2015-01-26 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2015-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |