NE LB656 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Notice of hearing for March 26, 2019
Pending: Legislature Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Nebraska Education Formula, terminate the Tax Equity and Educational Opportunities Support Act, and change levy limits and the base limitation for school districts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Nebraska Education Formula, terminate the Tax Equity and Educational Opportunities Support Act, and change levy limits and the base limitation for school districts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 26, 2019
2019-01-25LegislatureReferred to Education Committee
2019-01-23LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback