NE LB647 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Approved by Governor on May 07, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Approved by Governor on May 07, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change cattle identification provisions of the Animal Importation Act
Title
Change cattle identification provisions of the Animal Importation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Al Davis [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 07, 2013 |
2013-05-02 | Legislature | Bolz explanation of vote |
2013-05-02 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 01, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2013-05-01 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2013-04-29 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER79 adopted |
2013-04-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER79 filed |
2013-04-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER79 |
2013-04-19 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2013-04-11 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2013-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 19, 2013 |
2013-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2013-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |