NE LB644 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Approved by Governor on April 2, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Approved by Governor on April 2, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the use of the Site and Building Development Fund
Title
Change provisions relating to the use of the Site and Building Development Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 42-1-6 (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Legislature - McDonnell AM2738 adopted (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Legislature - Slama AM1476 adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Legislature - McDonnell AM2738 adopted (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Legislature - Slama AM1476 adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 2, 2024 |
2024-03-28 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 28, 2024 |
2024-03-28 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-03-28 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 42-1-6 |
2024-03-12 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ST45 recorded |
2024-03-12 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ST45 filed |
2024-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST45 |
2024-03-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-03-04 | Legislature | McDonnell AM2738 adopted |
2024-03-04 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER68 adopted |
2024-02-28 | Legislature | McDonnell AM2738 filed |
2024-02-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER68 filed |
2024-02-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER68 |
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-02-12 | Legislature | Slama AM1476 adopted |
2024-02-12 | Legislature | Slama AM1476 filed |
2024-02-07 | Legislature | Vargas name added |
2024-02-06 | Legislature | Conrad MO756 withdrawn |
2024-02-06 | Legislature | Conrad MO755 withdrawn |
2024-02-06 | Legislature | Conrad MO754 withdrawn |
2024-02-06 | Legislature | Conrad MO753 withdrawn |
2024-02-06 | Legislature | Conrad MO752 withdrawn |
2024-02-06 | Legislature | Conrad MO751 withdrawn |
2024-02-06 | Legislature | Conrad MO750 withdrawn |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Conrad MO755 Bracket until June 2, 2023 filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Conrad MO752 Bracket until June 1, 2023 filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Conrad MO756 Recommit to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Conrad MO754 Recommit to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Conrad MO751 Recommit to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Conrad MO753 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2023-03-31 | Legislature | Conrad MO750 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6 Section 3(f) filed |
2023-03-14 | Legislature | Jacobson priority bill |
2023-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2023 |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |