NE LB644 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Approved by Governor on May 23, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Approved by Governor on May 23, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide, change, and eliminate provisions governing boards, commissions, and similar entities
Title
Provide, change, and eliminate provisions governing boards, commissions, and similar entities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 23, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 18, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-05-18 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2017-05-18 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2017-05-16 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST36 |
2017-05-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-05-15 | Legislature | Murante AM1361 adopted |
2017-05-15 | Legislature | Murante AM1361 filed |
2017-05-15 | Legislature | Bolz AM1390 withdrawn |
2017-05-15 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER86 adopted |
2017-05-11 | Legislature | Bolz AM1390 filed |
2017-05-05 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER86 filed |
2017-05-05 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER86 |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Krist FA72 adopted |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Krist FA72 filed |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1111 adopted |
2017-04-21 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1111 filed |
2017-04-21 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1111 |
2017-03-09 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs priority bill |
2017-02-15 | Legislature | Chambers MO18 failed |
2017-02-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 23, 2017 |
2017-01-30 | Legislature | Chambers motion to reconsider the vote on the motion to overrule the Speaker's Agenda failed |
2017-01-30 | Legislature | Chambers motion to overrule the Speaker's Agenda failed |
2017-01-24 | Legislature | Blood name withdrawn |
2017-01-24 | Legislature | Chambers MO18 Rerefer to Judiciary Committee filed |
2017-01-24 | Legislature | Rereferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |