NE LB642 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide duties for the Adjutant General regarding Nebraska National Guard members impacted by the COVID-19 vaccine mandate
Title
Provide duties for the Adjutant General regarding Nebraska National Guard members impacted by the COVID-19 vaccine mandate
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-02-24 | Legislature | Kauth name added |
2023-02-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 23, 2023 |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |