NE LB642 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Approved by Governor on May 26, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Approved by Governor on May 26, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Department of Revenue to enter into contracts for products and services
Title
Authorize the Department of Revenue to enter into contracts for products and services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Approved by Governor on May 26, 2011 | |
2011-05-23 | Presented to Governor on May 23, 2011 | |
2011-05-23 | Sullivan explanation of vote | |
2011-05-23 | President/Speaker signed | |
2011-05-23 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 37-4-8 | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2011-05-18 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2011-05-18 | Cornett AM1468 adopted | |
2011-05-18 | Enrollment and Review ER134 adopted | |
2011-05-17 | Cornett AM1468 filed | |
2011-05-17 | Enrollment and Review ER134 filed | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on Select File with ER134 | |
2011-05-11 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2011-05-11 | Avery FA25 adopted | |
2011-05-11 | Avery FA25 filed | |
2011-05-11 | Revenue AM493 adopted | |
2011-05-11 | Pankonin FA23 adopted | |
2011-05-11 | Pankonin FA23 filed | |
2011-05-11 | Cornett AM1401 withdrawn | |
2011-05-11 | Cornett AM1401 pending | |
2011-05-11 | Cornett AM1315 withdrawn | |
2011-05-11 | Revenue AM493 pending | |
2011-05-10 | Cornett AM1401 filed | |
2011-04-28 | Cornett AM1315 filed | |
2011-02-28 | Revenue AM493 filed | |
2011-02-28 | Placed on General File with AM493 | |
2011-02-28 | Cornett priority bill | |
2011-02-09 | Notice of hearing for February 24, 2011 | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Revenue Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Date of introduction |