NE LB641 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB230 amended into LB641 by AM893
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB230 amended into LB641 by AM893
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create a Bioscience Innovation Program and the Nebraska Economic Development Task Force
Title
Create a Bioscience Innovation Program and the Nebraska Economic Development Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause stricken 31-5-13 (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Failed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 32-7-10 (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause stricken 31-5-13 (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Failed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 32-7-10 (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Failed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 32-7-10 (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause stricken 31-5-13 (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Failed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 32-7-10 (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB230 amended into LB641 by AM893 |
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 24, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Correctly Enrolled |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause stricken 31-5-13 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Failed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 32-7-10 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Erdman MO97 withdrawn |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Erdman MO97 Recommit to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee filed |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST6 |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Schumacher FA54 adopted |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Schumacher FA54 filed |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Watermeier AM893 adopted |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Watermeier AM893 filed |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Schumacher MO69 withdrawn |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Schumacher MO69 Bracket until June 2, 2017 filed |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Lindstrom AM902 adopted |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Lindstrom AM902 filed |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Schumacher FA52 lost |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Schumacher FA52 filed |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Schumacher AM868 adopted |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Schumacher AM868 filed |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Morfeld AM854 adopted |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER32 adopted |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Morfeld AM854 filed |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER32 filed |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER32 |
2017-03-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-03-28 | Legislature | Morfeld AM747 adopted |
2017-03-28 | Legislature | Morfeld AM747 filed |
2017-03-28 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM560 adopted |
2017-03-09 | Legislature | Morfeld priority bill |
2017-03-09 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM560 filed |
2017-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM560 |
2017-03-06 | Legislature | Baker name added |
2017-03-02 | Legislature | Lindstrom name added |
2017-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 06, 2017 |
2017-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2017-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |