NE LB640 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require an off-campus location of a hospital to obtain and use a separate National Provider Identifier in billing for health care services
Title
Require an off-campus location of a hospital to obtain and use a separate National Provider Identifier in billing for health care services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB640 amended into LB296 by AM1179 |
2023-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 07, 2023 |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |