NE LB640 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB640 amended into LB1131 by AM2456
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB640 amended into LB1131 by AM2456
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Include study relative to the Holocaust and other genocides in provisions relating to multicultural education
Title
Include study relative to the Holocaust and other genocides in provisions relating to multicultural education
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Howard [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB640 amended into LB1131 by AM2456 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-31 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2020-01-30 | Legislature | Hilkemann name added |
2020-01-30 | Legislature | Morfeld name added |
2020-01-30 | Legislature | Walz name added |
2020-01-30 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | La Grone name added |
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Slama name added |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 18, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37795 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB640.pdf |