NE LB637 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Provisions/portions of LB635 amended into LB637 by AM883
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Provisions/portions of LB635 amended into LB637 by AM883
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Postsecondary Institution Act and change provisions relating to higher education
Title
Adopt the Postsecondary Institution Act and change provisions relating to higher education
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Adams [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Provisions/portions of LB635 amended into LB637 by AM883 | |
2011-05-26 | Provisions/portions of LB372 amended into LB637 by AM838 | |
2011-05-26 | Provisions/portions of LB58 amended into LB637 by AM838 | |
2011-05-04 | Approved by Governor on May 04, 2011 | |
2011-04-28 | Presented to Governor on April 28, 2011 | |
2011-04-28 | President/Speaker signed | |
2011-04-28 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 | |
2011-04-28 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2011-04-20 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2011-04-20 | Adams AM1191 adopted | |
2011-04-20 | Enrollment and Review ER85 adopted | |
2011-04-13 | Adams AM1191 filed | |
2011-04-11 | Enrollment and Review ER85 filed | |
2011-04-11 | Placed on Select File with ER85 | |
2011-04-07 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2011-04-07 | Avery AM883 adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Avery AM883 filed | |
2011-04-07 | Adams AM1057 adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Education AM838 adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Adams AM1057 filed | |
2011-03-17 | Education AM838 filed | |
2011-03-17 | Placed on General File with AM838 | |
2011-03-08 | Education priority bill | |
2011-01-24 | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2011 | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Education Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Date of introduction |