NE LB63 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Approved by Governor on March 07, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Approved by Governor on March 07, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change tax levy provisions relating to rural and suburban fire protection districts and change the Mutual Finance Assistance Act
Title
Change tax levy provisions relating to rural and suburban fire protection districts and change the Mutual Finance Assistance Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Legislature - Groene AM187 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Legislature - Chambers MO6 failed (Y: 2 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-05 - Legislature - Chambers FA1 lost (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - Legislature - Revenue AM77 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Legislature - Chambers MO5 failed (Y: 3 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - Legislature - Revenue AM77 adopted (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Legislature - Groene AM187 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Legislature - Chambers MO6 failed (Y: 2 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-05 - Legislature - Chambers FA1 lost (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - Legislature - Revenue AM77 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Legislature - Chambers MO5 failed (Y: 3 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - Legislature - Revenue AM77 adopted (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 07, 2019 |
2019-03-04 | Legislature | Wayne explanation of vote |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 01, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST3 |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Groene AM187 adopted |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Groene AM187 filed |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER14 adopted |
2019-02-07 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER14 filed |
2019-02-07 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER14 |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Chambers FA2 withdrawn |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Chambers FA2 filed |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Chambers MO6 failed |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Chambers MO6 Reconsider the vote on FA1 filed |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Chambers FA1 lost |
2019-02-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA1 filed |
2019-02-04 | Legislature | Chambers MO5 failed |
2019-02-04 | Legislature | Chambers MO5 Reconsider the vote on AM77 filed |
2019-02-04 | Legislature | Revenue AM77 adopted |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Revenue AM77 filed |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM77 |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |