NE LB628 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Provisions/portions of LB139 amended into LB628 by AM977
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Provisions/portions of LB139 amended into LB628 by AM977
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to sale and permit donation of certain personal property of political subdivisions
Title
Change provisions relating to sale and permit donation of certain personal property of political subdivisions
Sponsors
Sen. Tanya Cook [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Provisions/portions of LB139 amended into LB628 by AM977 | |
2011-05-24 | Approved by Governor on May 24, 2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Presented to Governor on May 18, 2011 | |
2011-05-18 | President/Speaker signed | |
2011-05-18 | Passed on Final Reading 43-1-5 | |
2011-05-10 | Placed on Final Reading Second | |
2011-05-05 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment | |
2011-05-05 | Cook AM1400 adopted | |
2011-05-05 | Returned to Select File for specific amendment | |
2011-05-05 | Cook AM1261 withdrawn | |
2011-05-05 | Bloomfield AM1263 withdrawn | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to return to Select File for specific amendment failed | |
2011-05-04 | Cook AM1400 filed | |
2011-05-03 | Cook AM1261 filed | |
2011-04-28 | Bloomfield AM1263 filed | |
2011-04-18 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2011-04-13 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2011-04-13 | Krist AM1073 withdrawn | |
2011-04-13 | Bloomfield AM1200 adopted | |
2011-04-13 | Bloomfield AM1200 filed | |
2011-04-12 | Krist AM1073 filed | |
2011-04-12 | Bloomfield AM1048 lost | |
2011-04-12 | Bloomfield AM1049 adopted | |
2011-04-12 | Enrollment and Review ER67 adopted | |
2011-03-30 | Bloomfield AM1048 filed | |
2011-03-30 | Bloomfield AM1049 filed | |
2011-03-30 | Enrollment and Review ER67 filed | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on Select File with ER67 | |
2011-03-29 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2011-03-29 | Lautenbaugh AM977 adopted | |
2011-03-29 | Lautenbaugh AM977 filed | |
2011-03-14 | Speaker priority bill | |
2011-02-22 | Placed on General File | |
2011-02-04 | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2011 | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Date of introduction |