NE LB624 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor on May 12, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor on May 12, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide procedure to withhold from the public law enforcement officers' residential addresses in county records
Title
Provide procedure to withhold from the public law enforcement officers' residential addresses in county records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 12, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 08, 2017 |
2017-05-08 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-05-08 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2017-04-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-04-20 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM330 adopted |
2017-02-27 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM330 filed |
2017-02-27 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM330 |
2017-02-06 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2017-02-06 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2017-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2017 |
2017-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |