NE LB622 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Judiciary AM697 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Medical Cannabis Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Medical Cannabis Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-20LegislatureJudiciary AM697 filed
2017-03-20LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM697
2017-03-13LegislatureWishart AM496 filed
2017-02-28LegislatureWishart priority bill
2017-01-30LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 15, 2017
2017-01-20LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2017-01-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback