NE LB617 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Krist name added
Pending: Legislature Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Industrial Hemp Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Industrial Hemp Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-24LegislatureKrist name added
2017-01-27LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 21, 2017
2017-01-20LegislatureReferred to Agriculture Committee
2017-01-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback