NE LB608 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Local Innovation Economic Development Act and change grant and fund provisions
Title
Adopt the Local Innovation Economic Development Act and change grant and fund provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Pirsch [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-04 | Title printed. Carryover bill | |
2011-02-09 | Notice of hearing for February 25, 2011 | |
2011-01-25 | Schilz name added | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Revenue Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=11700 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB608.pdf |