NE LB607 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Approved by Governor on April 2, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Approved by Governor on April 2, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to grants for the 211 Information and Referral Network
Title
Change provisions relating to grants for the 211 Information and Referral Network
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 35-0-14 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Legislature - McDonnell AM2264 adopted (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Legislature - McDonnell AM2264 adopted (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 2, 2024 |
2024-03-28 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 28, 2024 |
2024-03-28 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-03-28 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 35-0-14 |
2024-03-25 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2024-03-18 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-03-18 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER81 adopted |
2024-03-12 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER81 filed |
2024-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER81 |
2024-03-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-03-04 | Legislature | McDonnell AM2264 adopted |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2024-02-14 | Legislature | McDonnell AM2264 filed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2023-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2023 |
2023-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |