NE LB595 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Water Resources Revolving Loan Fund Act and change provisions regarding certain revenue
Title
Adopt the Water Resources Revolving Loan Fund Act and change provisions regarding certain revenue
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Carlson [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-04 | Title printed. Carryover bill | |
2011-03-10 | Natural Resources priority bill | |
2011-02-22 | Notice of hearing for March 02, 2011 | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Natural Resources Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=12287 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB595.pdf |