NE LB593 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change and eliminate provisions relating to medical assistance reimbursement claims and liens and provide for retroactivity
Title
Change and eliminate provisions relating to medical assistance reimbursement claims and liens and provide for retroactivity
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Briese [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Legislature - Lathrop AM1935 adopted (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Judiciary AM996 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Legislature - Lathrop AM1935 adopted (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Judiciary AM996 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Lathrop AM1935 adopted |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Lathrop AM1935 filed |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER133 adopted |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER133 filed |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER133 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Judiciary AM996 adopted |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Wayne MO41 withdrawn |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Judiciary AM996 filed |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM996 |
2019-03-27 | Legislature | Wayne MO41 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Slama priority bill |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |