NE LB59 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Approved by Governor on April 24, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Approved by Governor on April 24, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change investigation and reporting provisions under the Children's Residential Facilities and Placing Licensure Act
Title
Change investigation and reporting provisions under the Children's Residential Facilities and Placing Licensure Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM622 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM622 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 24, 2019 |
2019-04-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 18, 2019 |
2019-04-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-04-18 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 |
2019-04-15 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-04-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-03-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-03-25 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-03-25 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM622 adopted |
2019-03-20 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM622 filed |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM622 |
2019-02-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 06, 2019 |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |