NE LB579A | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-04 - Approved by Governor on June 04, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-04 - Approved by Governor on June 04, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on June 04, 2013 |
2013-05-30 | Legislature | Seiler explanation of vote |
2013-05-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 29, 2013 |
2013-05-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2013-05-29 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 41-1-7 |
2013-05-29 | Legislature | Chambers FA136 withdrawn |
2013-05-23 | Legislature | Chambers FA136 filed |
2013-05-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2013-04-29 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2013-04-18 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2013-04-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |