NE LB579 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB579 amended into LB269 by AM611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize issuance of ignition interlock permits to persons who caused serious bodily injury while driving under the influence

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize issuance of ignition interlock permits to persons who caused serious bodily injury while driving under the influence

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB579 amended into LB269 by AM611
2019-05-31LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2019-05-31LegislatureMotion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed
2019-05-24LegislatureMotion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed
2019-02-26LegislatureJudiciary AM345 filed
2019-02-26LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM345
2019-02-05LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 13, 2019
2019-01-25LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2019-01-22LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback