NE LB575 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Riepe name withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Sports and Spaces Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Sports and Spaces Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-30LegislatureRiepe name withdrawn
2023-03-30LegislatureHunt MO671 Bracket until June 2, 2023 filed
2023-03-30LegislatureHunt MO668 Bracket until June 1, 2023 filed
2023-03-30LegislatureHunt MO672 Recommit to Education Committee filed
2023-03-30LegislatureHunt MO670 Recommit to Education Committee filed
2023-03-30LegislatureHunt MO667 Recommit to Education Committee filed
2023-03-30LegislatureHunt MO669 Indefinitely postpone filed
2023-03-30LegislatureHunt MO666 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6 Section 3(f) filed
2023-03-15LegislatureKauth AM875 filed
2023-03-15LegislatureKauth AM874 filed
2023-03-14LegislatureClements priority bill
2023-02-07LegislatureHunt AM239 filed
2023-02-07LegislatureCorrection
2023-02-03LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 13, 2023
2023-01-31LegislatureArmendariz name added
2023-01-25LegislatureHunt AM73 filed
2023-01-19LegislatureReferred to Education Committee
2023-01-17LegislatureHunt MO10 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6 Section 3(f) filed
2023-01-17LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=49722
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Intro/LB575.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO10.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM73.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM239.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM874.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM875.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO666.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO667.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO668.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO669.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO670.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO671.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO672.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/FN/LB575_20230210-111029.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/SI/LB575.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback