NE LB575 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Require school district policies regarding the provision of information to and access by military recruiters
Title
Require school district policies regarding the provision of information to and access by military recruiters
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 40-1-8 (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Legislature - Education AM175 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Legislature - Education AM175 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | M. Hansen explanation of vote |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 15, 2019 |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 40-1-8 |
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-02-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-21 | Legislature | Education AM175 adopted |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Education AM175 filed |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM175 |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Erdman name added |
2019-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2019 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |