NE LB561 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB560 amended into LB561 by AM426
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB560 amended into LB561 by AM426
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Rename and change powers and duties of the State Racing Commission and provide regulation and enforcement regarding sports wagering and other gambling activities at licensed racetrack enclosures
Title
Rename and change powers and duties of the State Racing Commission and provide regulation and enforcement regarding sports wagering and other gambling activities at licensed racetrack enclosures
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Briese [N] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-3-2 (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Legislature - Lathrop AM1427 adopted (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Legislature - Hilgers AM1256 adopted (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Pansing Brooks AM807 lost (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 16 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Briese AM983 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Briese AM982 lost (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Legislature - General Affairs AM641 adopted (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Legislature - General Affairs AM640 adopted (Y: 31 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Legislature - General Affairs AM639 adopted (Y: 26 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Legislature - Lathrop AM1427 adopted (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Legislature - Hilgers AM1256 adopted (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Pansing Brooks AM807 lost (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 16 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Briese AM983 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Briese AM982 lost (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Legislature - General Affairs AM641 adopted (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Legislature - General Affairs AM640 adopted (Y: 31 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Legislature - General Affairs AM639 adopted (Y: 26 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB560 amended into LB561 by AM426 |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-3-2 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading Third |
2021-05-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment |
2021-05-13 | Legislature | Lathrop AM1427 adopted |
2021-05-13 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2021-05-12 | Legislature | Lathrop AM1427 filed |
2021-05-11 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading Second |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Hilgers AM1256 adopted |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2021-05-06 | Legislature | Hilgers AM1256 filed |
2021-04-23 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST15 |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM807 lost |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM807 filed |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Briese AM983 adopted |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Briese AM982 lost |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Briese AM983 filed |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Briese AM982 filed |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Briese AM863 divided |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Briese FA13 withdrawn |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER25 adopted |
2021-04-06 | Legislature | Attorney General Opinion 21-004 to Lowe |
2021-04-06 | Legislature | Briese AM863 filed |
2021-03-29 | Legislature | Briese FA13 filed |
2021-03-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 29, 2021 on AM639 |
2021-03-22 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER25 filed |
2021-03-22 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER25 |
2021-03-17 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-03-17 | Legislature | General Affairs AM641 adopted |
2021-03-17 | Legislature | General Affairs AM640 adopted |
2021-03-17 | Legislature | General Affairs AM640 pending |
2021-03-17 | Legislature | General Affairs AM639 adopted |
2021-03-17 | Legislature | General Affairs AM641 filed |
2021-03-17 | Legislature | General Affairs AM640 filed |
2021-03-17 | Legislature | General Affairs AM639 filed |
2021-03-17 | Legislature | General Affairs AM426 divided |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | General Affairs AM426 filed |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM426 |
2021-03-04 | Legislature | General Affairs priority bill |
2021-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2021 |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |