NE LB560 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB903 amended into LB560 by AM2131
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions of the Nebraska Wage Payment and Collection Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions of the Nebraska Wage Payment and Collection Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB903 amended into LB560 by AM2131
2014-04-02LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 02, 2014
2014-03-27LegislaturePresented to Governor on March 27, 2014
2014-03-27LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2014-03-27LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 42-0-7
2014-03-24LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2014-03-19LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2014-03-19LegislatureLathrop AM2391 adopted
2014-03-19LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER161 adopted
2014-03-18LegislatureLathrop AM2391 filed
2014-03-11LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER161 filed
2014-03-11LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER161
2014-03-06LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2014-03-06LegislatureBusiness and Labor AM1958 adopted
2014-03-06LegislatureSmith FA241 adopted
2014-03-06LegislatureSmith FA241 filed
2014-03-06LegislatureSchumacher FA240 lost
2014-03-06LegislatureSchumacher FA240 pending
2014-03-06LegislatureSchumacher FA240 filed
2014-03-06LegislatureBusiness and Labor AM1958 pending
2014-02-21LegislatureBusiness and Labor AM1958 filed
2014-02-21LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM1958
2014-02-20LegislatureBusiness and Labor priority bill
2014-01-08LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill.
2013-01-28LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 04, 2013
2013-01-24LegislatureReferred to Business and Labor Committee
2013-01-23LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback